Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1535 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2022