Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1546 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-SB1546 HFLR Page 1
4-BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
3+ENGR. S. B. NO. 1546 Page 1 1
54 2
65 3
76 4
87 5
98 6
109 7
1110 8
1211 9
1312 10
1413 11
1514 12
1615 13
1716 14
1817 15
1918 16
2019 17
2120 18
2221 19
2322 20
2423 21
2524 22
2625 23
2726 24
28-
29-HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION
30-
31-STATE OF OKLAHOMA
32-
33-2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022)
3427
3528 ENGROSSED SENATE
3629 BILL NO. 1546 By: McCortney and Treat of the
3730 Senate
3831
3932 and
4033
4134 McCall of the House
4235
4336
4437
4538 An Act relating to the Red River Boundary Commission;
4639 amending 74 O.S. 2021, Section s 6111 and 6112, which
4740 relate to the appointment of the chairperson and
4841 report required from Commission; updating statutory
4942 references; modifying certain dates; and providing an
5043 effective date.
5144
5245
5346
5447
5548 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA:
5649 SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 74 O.S. 2021, Section 6111, is
5750 amended to read as follows:
5851 Section 6111. The chairperson of the Red River Boundary
5952 Commission shall be jointly appointed by the Governor, the President
6053 Pro Tempore of the Sen ate and the Speaker of the House of
6154 Representatives from the Commission members identified in Section 1
6255 of this act Section 6110 of this title, no later than thirty (30)
6356 days after the effective date of this act April 28, 2021. The first
6457 meeting of the Red River Boundary Commission, as re-created in
6558 Section 1 of this act Section 6110 of this title , shall be held at
59+the call of the chairperson but no later than December 31, 2021
60+December 31, 2022.
6661
67-SB1546 HFLR Page 2
68-BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
62+ENGR. S. B. NO. 1546 Page 2 1
6963 2
7064 3
7165 4
7266 5
7367 6
7468 7
7569 8
7670 9
7771 10
7872 11
7973 12
8074 13
8175 14
8276 15
8377 16
8478 17
8579 18
8680 19
8781 20
8882 21
8983 22
9084 23
9185 24
9286
93-the call of the chairperson but no later than December 31, 2021
94-December 31, 2022.
9587 SECTION 2. AMENDATORY 74 O.S. 2021 , Section 6112, is
9688 amended to read as follows:
9789 Section 6112. A. The Red River Boundary Commission shall
9890 confer and act in conjunction with the representatives to be
9991 appointed on behalf of the State of Texas for the following
10092 purposes:
10193 1. To evaluate the methods, surveys, historical maps, and other
10294 information used to establish the boundary line between th is state
10395 and the State of Texas in the Texoma Area, as such area is defined
10496 in the Texoma Area Boundary Agreement;
10597 2. To determine the location of the south bank of the Red River
10698 as the bank was located and marked by the United States Army Corps
10799 of Engineers before the beginning of construction of Lake Texoma, in
108100 accordance with subsection C of Article II of Section 6106 of T itle
109101 74 of the Oklahoma Statu tes;
110102 3. To redraw the boundary line between this state and the State
111103 of Texas on any real property for which the United States Army Corps
112104 of Engineers granted an easemen t, prior to August 31, 2000, to at
113105 least two districts or authorities created under Se ction 59 of
114106 Article XVI of the Texas Constitu tion for the construction,
115107 operation, and maintenance of a water pipeline and related
116108 facilities in the Texoma Area in order to negate any effects the
109+boundary as it is currently dra wn has on property interests
110+associated with such easements in the Texoma Area, and to redraw the
117111
118-SB1546 HFLR Page 3
119-BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
112+ENGR. S. B. NO. 1546 Page 3 1
120113 2
121114 3
122115 4
123116 5
124117 6
125118 7
126119 8
127120 9
128121 10
129122 11
130123 12
131124 13
132125 14
133126 15
134127 16
135128 17
136129 18
137130 19
138131 20
139132 21
140133 22
141134 23
142135 24
143136
144-boundary as it is currently d rawn has on property interests
145-associated with such easements in the Texoma Area, and to redraw the
146137 boundary on such real property so t hat there is no net loss of
147138 property between either state so as to ensure that the redrawn
148139 boundary does not increase the p olitical power or influence o f
149140 either state, in accordance with:
150141 a. the Lake Texoma preconstruction survey of the south
151142 bank of the Red River prepared by the United States
152143 Army Corps of Engineers, o r
153144 b. other historical records or documentation of the
154145 United States Army Corps of Engin eers identifying the
155146 location of the south ba nk of the Red River, if the
156147 survey described by subparagrap h a of this paragraph
157148 is unavailable;
158149 4. To hold hearings and conferences in this state and in the
159150 State of Texas as neces sary to accomplish the purpos es of this act
160151 Section 6110 et seq. of this title ; and
161152 5. To take other action, alone or in cooperation with the State
162153 of Texas or the United States, necessary to accomplish the purposes
163154 of this act Section 6110 et seq. of this title .
164155 B. No later than January 15, 2022 January 15, 2023, the
165156 Commission shall rep ort to the Governor, the Lieutenant Governor,
166157 the President Pro Tempore of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of
167158 Representatives, and appropriate committees of the Legislature the
159+Commission’s findings and recommendations concerning joint action by
160+this state and the State of Texas regarding the amendment of the
168161
169-SB1546 HFLR Page 4
170-BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
162+ENGR. S. B. NO. 1546 Page 4 1
171163 2
172164 3
173165 4
174166 5
175167 6
176168 7
177169 8
178170 9
179171 10
180172 11
181173 12
182174 13
183175 14
184176 15
185177 16
186178 17
187179 18
188180 19
189181 20
190182 21
191183 22
192184 23
193185 24
194186
195-Commission’s findings and recommendations concerning joint action by
196-this state and the State of Texas regarding the amendment of the
197187 Texoma Area Boundary Agreement to incorporate the boundar y between
198188 this state and the State of Texas in the Texoma Area as redrawn . No
199189 later than July 30, 2025 July 30, 2026, the Commission shall issue a
200190 final report to the Governor, the Lieutenant Governor, the President
201191 Pro Tempore of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of
202192 Representatives, and appropriate committees of the Legislature.
203193 SECTION 3. This act shall become effective November 1, 2022.
194+Passed the Senate the 22nd day of March, 2022.
204195
205-COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RULES, dated 04/05/2022 - DO PASS.
196+
197+
198+ Presiding Officer of the Senate
199+
200+
201+Passed the House of Representatives the ____ day of __________,
202+2022.
203+
204+
205+
206+ Presiding Officer of the House
207+ of Representatives
208+