Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1546 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/05/2022

                             
 
SB1546 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
ENGROSSED SENATE 
BILL NO. 1546 	By: McCortney and Treat of the 
Senate 
 
  and 
 
  McCall of the House 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Red River Boundary Commission; 
amending 74 O.S. 2021, Section s 6111 and 6112, which 
relate to the appointment of the chairperson and 
report required from Commission; updating statutory 
references; modifying certain dates; and providing an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     74 O.S. 2021, Section 6111, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 6111. The chairperson of the Red River Boundary 
Commission shall be jointly appointed by the Governor, the P resident 
Pro Tempore of the Sen ate and the Speaker of the House of 
Representatives from the Commission members identified in Section 1 
of this act Section 6110 of this title, no later than thirty (30) 
days after the effective date of this act April 28, 2021.  The first 
meeting of the Red River Boundary Commission, as re-created in 
Section 1 of this act Section 6110 of this title , shall be held at   
 
SB1546 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
the call of the chairperson but no later than December 31, 2021 
December 31, 2022. 
SECTION 2.    AMENDATORY     74 O.S. 2021 , Section 6112, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 6112. A.  The Red River Boundary Commission shall 
confer and act in conjunction with the representatives to be 
appointed on behalf of the State of Texas for the followin g 
purposes: 
1.  To evaluate the methods, surveys, historical maps, and other 
information used to establish the boundary line between th is state 
and the State of Texas in the Texoma Area, as such area is defined 
in the Texoma Area Boundary Agreement; 
2.  To determine the location of the south bank of the Red River 
as the bank was located and marked by the United States Army Corps 
of Engineers before the beginning of construction of Lake Texoma, in 
accordance with subsection C of Article II of Section 6106 of Title 
74 of the Oklahoma Statu tes; 
3.  To redraw the boundary line between this state and the State 
of Texas on any real property for which the United States Army Corps 
of Engineers granted an easemen t, prior to August 31, 2000, to at 
least two districts or authorities created under Se ction 59 of 
Article XVI of the Texas Constitu tion for the construction, 
operation, and maintenance of a water pipeline and related 
facilities in the Texoma Area in order to negate any effects the   
 
SB1546 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
boundary as it is currently d rawn has on property interests 
associated with such easements in the Texoma Area, and to redraw the 
boundary on such real property so t hat there is no net loss of 
property between either state so as to ensure that the redrawn 
boundary does not increase the political power or influence o f 
either state, in accordance with: 
a. the Lake Texoma preconstruction survey of the south 
bank of the Red River prepared by the United States 
Army Corps of Engineers, o r 
b. other historical records or documentation of the 
United States Army Corps of Engin eers identifying the 
location of the south ba nk of the Red River, if the 
survey described by subparagrap h a of this paragraph 
is unavailable; 
4.  To hold hearings and conferences in this state and in the 
State of Texas as nec essary to accomplish the purpos es of this act 
Section 6110 et seq. of this title ; and 
5. To take other action, alone or in cooperation with the State 
of Texas or the United States, necessary to accomplish the purposes 
of this act Section 6110 et seq. of t his title. 
B.  No later than January 15, 2022 January 15, 2023, the 
Commission shall rep ort to the Governor, the Lieutenant Governor, 
the President Pro Tempore of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of 
Representatives, and appropriate committees of the Legislature the   
 
SB1546 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Commission’s findings and recommendations concerning joint action by 
this state and the State of Texas regarding the amendment of the 
Texoma Area Boundary Agreement to incorporate the boundar y between 
this state and the State of Texas in the Texoma Area as redrawn .  No 
later than July 30, 2025 July 30, 2026, the Commission shall issue a 
final report to the Governor, the Lieutenant Governor, the President 
Pro Tempore of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of 
Representatives, and appropriate co mmittees of the Legislature. 
SECTION 3.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2022. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RULES, dated 04/05/2022 - DO PASS.