House | 04/12/2022 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Treat |