Senate | 04/29/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/29/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 14 | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Treat |