Senate | 04/28/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/28/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 15 | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Weaver |