Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1565 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022