Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1578 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022