Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Simpson
|
|
|