House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 11 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Allen | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Brooks |