House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Patzkowsky | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Energy | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Murdock |