Senate | 04/29/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/29/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Stinson (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Howard |