Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1596 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2022

Amended

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill February 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2022