Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1600 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 10, 2022

Amended

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022