Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1605 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 10, 2022

Amended

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2022
Bill April 11, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022