Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1605 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2022

                             
 
Req. No. 3903 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
CONFERENCE COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR ENGROSSED 
SENATE BILL 1605 	By: Quinn and Bullard of the 
Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Kerbs and Osburn of the 
House 
 
 
 
CONFERENCE COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to motor vehicles; amending 47 O.S. 
2021, Section 1107, as last amended by Section 115 of 
Enrolled House Bill N o. 3419 of the 2nd Session of 
the 58th Legislature, which relates to the sale or 
transfer of ownership of a vehicle; authorizing the 
use of an electronic signature on documents required 
for the transfer of ownership of a vehicle resulting 
from the settlement of a total loss claim; conforming 
language; and providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE O F OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     47 O.S. 2021, Section 1107, as 
last amended by Section 115 of Enrolled House Bill N o. 3419 of the 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature, is amended to read as follows: 
Section 1107. A.  In the event of the sale or transfer of the 
ownership of a vehicle fo r which a certificate of title ha s been 
issued as provided by Section 1105 of this title, the holder of such 
certificate shall endorse on the back of same a complete assignment 
thereof with warranty of title in form printed thereon with a   
 
Req. No. 3903 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
statement of all liens or encumbrances on the vehi cle, sworn to 
before a notary public or some other person authorized by law to 
take acknowledgments, and deliver same to the purchaser or 
transferee at the time of delivery to the purchaser or transferee of 
the vehicle; provided, a transfer of the ownershi p of a vehicle to 
an insurer resulting from the settlement of a total loss claim shall 
not require a notarized signature on the certificate of title.  In 
the event that any other documents required for the transfer of 
ownership of a vehicle to an insurer resulting from the settlement 
of a total loss claim require a notarized signature, such documents 
shall be permitted to be signed electronically pursuant to Section 
15-109 of Title 12A of the Oklahoma Statutes in lieu of such 
requirement. The purchaser or transferee, unless such person is a 
bona fide used motor vehicle dealer licensed by this state, a retail 
implement dealer in connection with the purchase or transfer of off-
road vehicles or a charitable organization shall, withi n thirty (30) 
days from the time of delivery to the purchaser or transferee of the 
vehicle, present the assigned cer tificate of title and the insurance 
security verification to the vehicle to Service Oklahoma, or one of 
its licensed operators, accompanied by a fee of Eleven Dollars 
($11.00), together with any motor vehicl e excise tax or license fee 
that may be due, whereupon a new certificate of title, shall be 
issued to the assignee.  One Dollar ($1.00) of each fee shall be 
deposited in the Oklahoma Tax Commission Reimbursement Fund through   
 
Req. No. 3903 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
December 31, 2022, and beginning January 1, 2023, this fee shall be 
deposited in the Service Oklahoma Reimbursement Fund.  Any 
charitable organization utilizing the exemption authorized by this 
subsection shall receive training as prescribed by the Oklah oma Used 
Motor Vehicle and Parts, Dismantler, and Manufactured Housing 
Commission. 
B.  A licensed dealer, a retail implement dealer in connection 
with the sale or disposal of off-road vehicles or a charitable 
organization shall, on selling or otherwise disposing of a vehicle, 
execute and deliver to the purchaser thereof the c ertificate of 
title properly and completely reassigned.  Thereupon, the purchaser 
of the vehicle shall present the reassigned certificate t o Service 
Oklahoma, or a licensed operator, accompanied by a fee of Eleven 
Dollars ($11.00), and any motor vehicle excise tax or license fee 
that may be due, whereupon a new certificate of title will be issued 
to the purchaser.  One Dollar ($1.00) of each fee shall be deposited 
in the Oklahoma Tax Commission Reimbursement Fund through December 
31, 2022, and beginning January 1, 2023, this fee shall be deposited 
in the Service Oklahoma Reimbursement Fund.  The certificate, when 
so assigned and returned to the Commission, together with any 
subsequent assignment or reiss ue thereof, shall be appropriately 
filed and indexed so that at all times it will be possible to trace 
title to the vehicle designated therein.  Provided, when the 
ownership of any motor vehicle shall pass by operation of law, t he   
 
Req. No. 3903 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
person owning the vehicle may, upon furnishing satisfactory proof to 
the Commission of ownership, procure a title to the motor vehicle, 
regardless of whether a certificate of title has ever been issued.  
The dealer shall execute and deliver to the purchaser bills of sale 
on forms prescribed by the Commission for all new vehicles sold by 
the dealer.  On presentation of a bill of sale executed on forms 
prescribed by the Commission, by a manufacturer or dealer for a new 
vehicle sold in this state, accompanied by remittance in the sum of 
Eleven Dollars ($11.00), together with any motor vehi cle excise tax 
or license fee that may be due, a certificate of title shall be 
issued in accordance with the provisions of the Oklahoma Vehicle 
License and Registration Act.  One Dollar ($1.00) of eac h fee shall 
be deposited in the Oklahoma Tax Commission Reimbursement Fund 
through December 31, 2022, and beginning January 1, 2023, this fee 
shall be deposited in the Service Oklahoma Reimbursement Fund.  For 
purposes of this subsection, “charitable organization” shall mean 
any organization which is exempt fro m taxation pursuant to the 
provisions of the Internal Revenue Code, 26 U.S.C., Section 
501(c)(3) and which is registered as a charitable organization with 
the Oklahoma Secretary of State and the Oklah oma Attorney General ’s 
office; “off-road vehicles” means all-terrain vehicles, utility 
vehicles, and motorcycles used exclusively for off-road use; “retail 
implement dealer” means a business engaged primarily in the sale of 
farm tractors as defined in Sect ion 1-118 of this title or   
 
Req. No. 3903 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
implements of husbandry as de fined in Section 1-125 of this title or 
a combination thereof. 
C.  Any person violating the provisions of this section shall be 
guilty of a misdemeanor and upon the first conviction thereof shall 
be punished by a fine no t to exceed Five Hundred Dollars ($5 00.00), 
with impoundment of the vehicle until all taxes and fees are paid.  
A second or subsequent conviction shall be punished by a fine not to 
exceed One Thousand Dollars ($1,000.00), with impoundme nt of the 
vehicle until all taxes and fees are paid.  If a vehicle is 
impounded pursuant to the provisions of this section, the vehicle 
shall not be released to the owner until the owner provides proof of 
security or an affidavit that the vehicle will not be used on public 
highways or public streets, as require d pursuant to Section 7-600 et 
seq. of this title.  Each vehicle involved in a violation of this 
section shall be considered a separate offense. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2022. 
 
58-2-3903 RD 5/20/2022 7:38:34 PM