Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Bell
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
SCs named Standridge, Bergstrom, Allen, David, Hamilton, Dossett (J.A.), Matthews
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Patzkowsky
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants, McBride
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Patzkowsky
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Remove as principal author Representative Patzkowsky and substitute with Representative Sterling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Murdock; authored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Patzkowsky (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|