House
|
05/11/2022
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
SCs named David, Weaver, McCortney, Standridge, Dahm, Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 40
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator David
|
|
|