Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1612 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022