Senate | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator David | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading |