House | 04/05/2022 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Pugh |