Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1631 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022