Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1696 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 24, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 12, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2022