Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
remove as principal author Representative Moore and substitute with Representative Newton
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
SCs named Jech, Leewright, Taylor, Paxton, Rosino, Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Third Reading vote rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Recalled from engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Jech
|
|
|