Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1697 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022