Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 35; Ayes: 47 Nays: 33
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Measure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 20
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|