Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams, Provenzano, Ranson
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, Waldron, Dollens
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Luttrell
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Walke (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|