Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB172 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 22, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 14, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 21, 2021