House | 04/11/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Wildlife | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Murdock |