House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Coauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Daniels |