Senate | 05/02/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/02/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | CR; Do Pass Wildlife Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Wildlife | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Stephens | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Garvin |