House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 32
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Remove Representative Hilbert as principal House author and substitute with Representative Munson
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Withdrawn from General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|