House | 04/05/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Pugh |