Senate | 05/02/2022 | HAs read | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Title restored | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Energy | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |