Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1835 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 7, 2022

Amended

Bill April 7, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022