Senate | 03/14/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Dollens | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.A.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Remove as author Senator Dossett (J.A.); authored by Senator Pugh | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Dossett (J.A.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading |