House | 04/05/2022 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Rogers | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Leewright |