Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB187 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2020

Engrossed

Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021