Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Approved by Governor 03/30/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Merrick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 19; Ayes: 68 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Ayes: 60 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Murdock, Dahm, Hamilton, Quinn, Stephens, Rogers, Bullard
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin), CrosswhiteHader, West (Josh), Humphrey, Conley, Stark, Russ, Boles, Townley, Gann, Kendrix, Lawson, McDugle, Roberts (Sean), Manger, Lowe (Dick), Steagall, Roe, Hardin (David), Grego, Dempsey, Smith, West (Rick), Sneed, Cornwell, Wolfley, Bashore, Olsen, Miller, Stearman, Baker
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Dills
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Withdrawn from Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|