Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB2 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021
Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2021