Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Nichols
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|