Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB200 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 29, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2021