Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB211 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 30, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021