Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Children, Youth and Family Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
SCs named Howard, Daniels, Bullard, Leewright, Paxton, Floyd, Brooks
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Remove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative Martinez
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Garvin; authored by Senator Howard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|