Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Vetoed 05/11/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 35; Ayes: 53 Nays: 35
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants, Echols
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Withdrawn from Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|