Senate | 05/03/2021 | Approved by Governor 05/03/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 18 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Energy | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Allen |