Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB246 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2021

Amended

Bill April 1, 2021
Bill February 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 1, 2021