House | 03/31/2021 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Coauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Rader |