Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named Murdock, Leewright, Rogers, Bergstrom, Brooks, Young
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 30
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|