Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB270 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021
Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021